Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fingerprinting

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0166
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1534 (SB1153)
Title
Handgun Permits - Criminal History Check - Fingerprint Submission Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1634 /CH0731 (SB1068/CH0732)
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0908
Title
Partial Repeal of Firearms Safety Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1068 /CH0732 (HB1634/CH0731)
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1153 (HB1534)
Title
Handgun Permits - Criminal History Check - Fingerprint Submission Exception
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0166 Health Occupations - State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - Revisions Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1534 (SB1153) Handgun Permits - Criminal History Check - Fingerprint Submission Exception Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1634 /CH0731 (SB1068/CH0732) Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018 Delegate Frick 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731
Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0908 Partial Repeal of Firearms Safety Act of 2013 Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1068 /CH0732 (HB1634/CH0731) Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 732
Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1153 (HB1534) Handgun Permits - Criminal History Check - Fingerprint Submission Exception Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM