Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fingerprinting

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0228 /CH0446 (SB0134/CH0447)
Title
State Board of Nursing – Criminal History Records Checks – Revised Statement
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0786 (SB0737)
Title
Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Secondary Transactions
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1354
Title
State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - License and Registration - Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0118
Title
Handgun Permits - Criminal History Records Checks - Fingerprint Submission Exception
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0134 /CH0447 (HB0228/CH0446)
Title
State Board of Nursing – Criminal History Records Checks – Revised Statement
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0623
Title
Juvenile Law - Police and Court Records - Access by Counsel
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737 (HB0786)
Title
Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Sales, Rentals, Transfers, and Loans
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0228 /CH0446 (SB0134/CH0447) State Board of Nursing – Criminal History Records Checks – Revised Statement Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2019 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0786 (SB0737) Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Secondary Transactions Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
2/25/2019 - 10:00 AM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1354 State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - License and Registration - Criminal History Records Checks Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0118 Handgun Permits - Criminal History Records Checks - Fingerprint Submission Exception Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0134 /CH0447 (HB0228/CH0446) State Board of Nursing – Criminal History Records Checks – Revised Statement Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0623 Juvenile Law - Police and Court Records - Access by Counsel Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0737 (HB0786) Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Sales, Rentals, Transfers, and Loans Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:24 PM