Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Fingerprinting

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0206 /CH0108 (SB0207/CH0109)
Title
Unaccompanied Minors in Need of Shelter and Supportive Services
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0225
Title
Gaming - Sports Wagering - Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0307
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0751
Title
State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - License and Registration - Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0784 (SB0957)
Title
Consumer Protection - Online Privacy - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1112 (SB0416)
Title
Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1257 (SB0816)
Title
Public Safety - Licensed Firearms Dealers (Firearms Dealers' Safety Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1400
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1656
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Privacy and Data Collection
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0004 /CH0492
Title
Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering Referendum and Minority Business Enterprise Disparity Study
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0043
Title
Licensing - Fingerprint Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0207 /CH0109 (HB0206/CH0108)
Title
Unaccompanied Minors in Need of Shelter and Supportive Services
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0416 (HB1112)
Title
Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0754
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Protection - Money Transmissions and Virtual Currencies
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0816 (HB1257)
Title
Public Safety - Licensed Firearms Dealers (Firearms Dealers' Safety Act)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0957 (HB0784)
Title
Maryland Online Consumer Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0206 /CH0108 (SB0207/CH0109) Unaccompanied Minors in Need of Shelter and Supportive Services Delegate Krimm 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 108
Appropriations
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0225 Gaming - Sports Wagering - Implementation Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0307 Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy Delegate Love 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0751 State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - License and Registration - Criminal History Records Checks Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0784 (SB0957) Consumer Protection - Online Privacy - Study Delegate Carey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Economic Matters
3/09/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1112 (SB0416) Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact Delegate Charles 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1257 (SB0816) Public Safety - Licensed Firearms Dealers (Firearms Dealers' Safety Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1400 Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1656 Commercial Law - Consumer Privacy and Data Collection Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0004 /CH0492 Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering Referendum and Minority Business Enterprise Disparity Study Senator Zucker 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 492
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0043 Licensing - Fingerprint Requirement Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0207 /CH0109 (HB0206/CH0108) Unaccompanied Minors in Need of Shelter and Supportive Services Senator Washington 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 109
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0416 (HB1112) Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0754 Financial Institutions - Consumer Protection - Money Transmissions and Virtual Currencies Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0816 (HB1257) Public Safety - Licensed Firearms Dealers (Firearms Dealers' Safety Act) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0957 (HB0784) Maryland Online Consumer Protection Act Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/1/2020 2:34 PM