Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fish and Fishing -see also- Aquaculture; Gill Nets

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0419 (SB0709)
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases - Consideration of User Conflicts
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0638
Title
Natural Resources - Oysters - Shell Seeding, Shell Replenishment, and Rotational Harvest
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0760 (SB0557)
Title
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0785 (SB0666/CH0376)
Title
Recreational Fishing Licenses - Duration and Expiration Date
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0860 /CH0461
Title
Aquatic Invasive Species - Decontamination of Vessels (State Lakes Invasive Species Act of 2015)
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0914 (SB0322)
Title
Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - Reward for Information
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0958 (SB0447)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - Hunting and Sporting Goods
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0998
Title
Natural Resources - Striped Bass Permits - Annual Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1005
Title
Natural Resources - Commercial Fisheries Offenses - Stay of Revocation
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1008
Title
Recreational Hunting and Fishing License Applications - Voter Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1174
Title
Kent County - Fisheries - Use of Haul Seines
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1287 /CH0307
Title
Tidal Fisheries Advisory Commission and Sport Fisheries Advisory Commission - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0083 /CH0322
Title
Environment - Vibrio Public Information Campaign
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0322 (HB0914)
Title
Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - Reward for Information
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0447 (HB0958)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - Hunting and Sporting Goods
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0557 (HB0760)
Title
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act)
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0666 /CH0376 (HB0785)
Title
Recreational Fishing Licenses - Duration and Expiration Date
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0709 (HB0419)
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases - Consideration of User Conflicts
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0419 (SB0709) Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases - Consideration of User Conflicts Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0638 Natural Resources - Oysters - Shell Seeding, Shell Replenishment, and Rotational Harvest Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0760 (SB0557) Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act) Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0785 (SB0666/CH0376) Recreational Fishing Licenses - Duration and Expiration Date Delegate Flanagan 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0860 /CH0461 Aquatic Invasive Species - Decontamination of Vessels (State Lakes Invasive Species Act of 2015) Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0914 (SB0322) Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - Reward for Information Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0958 (SB0447) Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - Hunting and Sporting Goods Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0998 Natural Resources - Striped Bass Permits - Annual Fees Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1005 Natural Resources - Commercial Fisheries Offenses - Stay of Revocation Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1008 Recreational Hunting and Fishing License Applications - Voter Registration Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1174 Kent County - Fisheries - Use of Haul Seines Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1287 /CH0307 Tidal Fisheries Advisory Commission and Sport Fisheries Advisory Commission - Membership Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0083 /CH0322 Environment - Vibrio Public Information Campaign Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 322
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0322 (HB0914) Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - Reward for Information Senator Middleton 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0447 (HB0958) Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - Hunting and Sporting Goods Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0557 (HB0760) Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act) Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0666 /CH0376 (HB0785) Recreational Fishing Licenses - Duration and Expiration Date Senator Bates 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 376
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0709 (HB0419) Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases - Consideration of User Conflicts Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM