Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fish and Fishing -see also- Aquaculture; Gill Nets

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0004 /CH0462 (SB0046/CH0463)
Title
Hunting and Fishing Licenses - Active Military, Former Prisoners of War, and Disabled Veterans
Sponsor
Delegate Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0029
Title
Tidal Fish License - Catching Crabs Using Trotline Gear - Holidays
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0068 /CH0461
Title
Hunting and Fishing - Discounted Licenses - Purple Heart Recipients
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0211 /CH0398 (SB0268/CH0399)
Title
Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Contests
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0368
Title
Hunting and Fishing Licenses and Stamps - Seniors, Veterans, and Military Personnel (Howard's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1314 /CH0400
Title
Crabs - Harvest Times - Holidays
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1339 (SB0554)
Title
Natural Resources - Gill Nets - Stretched Mesh Size
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0046 /CH0463 (HB0004/CH0462)
Title
Hunting and Fishing Licenses - Active Military, Former Prisoners of War, Recipients of the Purple Heart Award, and Disabled Veterans
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0059 /CH0401
Title
Crabs - Harvest Times - Holidays
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0268 /CH0399 (HB0211/CH0398)
Title
Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Contests
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0554 (HB1339)
Title
Natural Resources - Gill Nets - Mesh Size
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0004 /CH0462 (SB0046/CH0463) Hunting and Fishing Licenses - Active Military, Former Prisoners of War, and Disabled Veterans Delegate Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 462
Environment and Transportation
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0029 Tidal Fish License - Catching Crabs Using Trotline Gear - Holidays Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0068 /CH0461 Hunting and Fishing - Discounted Licenses - Purple Heart Recipients Delegate Carey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Environment and Transportation
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0211 /CH0398 (SB0268/CH0399) Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Contests Delegate Robinson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0368 Hunting and Fishing Licenses and Stamps - Seniors, Veterans, and Military Personnel (Howard's Law) Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1314 /CH0400 Crabs - Harvest Times - Holidays Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1339 (SB0554) Natural Resources - Gill Nets - Stretched Mesh Size Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0046 /CH0463 (HB0004/CH0462) Hunting and Fishing Licenses - Active Military, Former Prisoners of War, Recipients of the Purple Heart Award, and Disabled Veterans Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 463
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0059 /CH0401 Crabs - Harvest Times - Holidays Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0268 /CH0399 (HB0211/CH0398) Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Contests Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0554 (HB1339) Natural Resources - Gill Nets - Mesh Size Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM