Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fish and Fishing -see also- Aquaculture; Gill Nets

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0363 (SB0305)
Title
More Jobs for Marylanders Act 2.0
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1137 /CH0518
Title
Natural Resources - Fisheries - Commercial Oyster Divers
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1172 /CH0520 (SB0558)
Title
Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1174
Title
Natural Resources - Oysters - Tolerance for Seafood Dealers
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1249
Title
Crab Harvest – Start Time – Days in July
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1284
Title
Tidal Fish Licenses - Authorization to Catch Crabs - Application Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1426
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases and Public Shellfish Fishery Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1485 /CH0531
Title
Natural Resources - Shellfish - Harvesting by Wharf Owners
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1547
Title
Natural Resources - Crabbing Authorizations - Reciprocity
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1693
Title
Consolidated Senior Sport Fishing License - Minimum Age
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1812
Title
Natural Resources - Haul Seines - Anne Arundel County
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 /CH0061
Title
Natural Resources - Tidal Fish Licenses
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0113 /CH0062
Title
Natural Resources - Recreational License Incentive Discount Program
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0183
Title
Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Recreational License Donation Fund - Donations
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0305 (HB0363)
Title
More Jobs for Marylanders Act 2.0
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0558 (HB1172/CH0520)
Title
Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0363 (SB0305) More Jobs for Marylanders Act 2.0 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1137 /CH0518 Natural Resources - Fisheries - Commercial Oyster Divers Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1172 /CH0520 (SB0558) Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1174 Natural Resources - Oysters - Tolerance for Seafood Dealers Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1249 Crab Harvest – Start Time – Days in July Delegate Adams 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1284 Tidal Fish Licenses - Authorization to Catch Crabs - Application Requirements Delegate Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1426 Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases and Public Shellfish Fishery Areas Delegate Adams 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1485 /CH0531 Natural Resources - Shellfish - Harvesting by Wharf Owners Delegate Fisher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1547 Natural Resources - Crabbing Authorizations - Reciprocity Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1693 Consolidated Senior Sport Fishing License - Minimum Age Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1812 Natural Resources - Haul Seines - Anne Arundel County Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0112 /CH0061 Natural Resources - Tidal Fish Licenses Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0113 /CH0062 Natural Resources - Recreational License Incentive Discount Program Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0183 Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Recreational License Donation Fund - Donations Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0305 (HB0363) More Jobs for Marylanders Act 2.0 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0558 (HB1172/CH0520) Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM