Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Fish and Fishing -see also- Aquaculture; Gill Nets

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0145
Title
Unlawful Taking of Oysters From Submerged Land Leases, Aquaculture Leases, and Water Column Leases – Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0204 (SB0324)
Title
Environment and Natural Resources - Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement - Information Maintenance and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0589 (SB0493)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0693 (SB0799)
Title
Cecil County - Fishing - Restrictions
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0755
Title
Natural Resources – Complimentary Angler’s License – Disabled Veterans
Sponsor
Delegate Thiam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0800
Title
Aquaculture Leases - Marking and Recording Requirements - Mobile Application
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0843
Title
Anne Arundel County - Natural Resources - Fishing With a Haul Seine
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1117
Title
Kent Narrows Bridge – State Highway Right–of–Way – Fishing Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1134 (SB0318)
Title
Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0001 (SJ0004)
Title
Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0004 (SJ0006)
Title
Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Commission - Atlantic Menhaden - Population Evaluation and Prohibition on Commercial Reduction Fishing
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0318 (HB1134)
Title
Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Rights
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0324 (HB0204)
Title
Environment and Natural Resources – Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement – Information Maintenance and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0343
Title
Natural Resources - Shrimp Fishery - Licensing and Regulation
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0346
Title
Department of Natural Resources - Public Notices and Hearings
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0350
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Leases
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0493 (HB0589)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737
Title
Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0799 (HB0693)
Title
Cecil County - Fishing - Restrictions
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0004 (HJ0001)
Title
Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0006 (HJ0004)
Title
Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Commission – Atlantic Menhaden – Population Evaluation and Prohibition on Commercial Reduction Fishing
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0145 Unlawful Taking of Oysters From Submerged Land Leases, Aquaculture Leases, and Water Column Leases – Penalties Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0204 (SB0324) Environment and Natural Resources - Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement - Information Maintenance and Reporting Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0589 (SB0493) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0693 (SB0799) Cecil County - Fishing - Restrictions Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0755 Natural Resources – Complimentary Angler’s License – Disabled Veterans Delegate Thiam 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0800 Aquaculture Leases - Marking and Recording Requirements - Mobile Application Delegate Clark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0843 Anne Arundel County - Natural Resources - Fishing With a Haul Seine Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1117 Kent Narrows Bridge – State Highway Right–of–Way – Fishing Prohibition Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1134 (SB0318) Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Rights Delegate Carey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HJ0001 (SJ0004) Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 9:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/22/2021 - 9:30 AM
HJ0004 (SJ0006) Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Commission - Atlantic Menhaden - Population Evaluation and Prohibition on Commercial Reduction Fishing Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 9:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/22/2021 - 9:30 AM
SB0318 (HB1134) Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Rights Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0324 (HB0204) Environment and Natural Resources – Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement – Information Maintenance and Reporting Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0343 Natural Resources - Shrimp Fishery - Licensing and Regulation Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2021 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0346 Department of Natural Resources - Public Notices and Hearings Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0350 Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Leases Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2021 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0493 (HB0589) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0737 Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0799 (HB0693) Cecil County - Fishing - Restrictions Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SJ0004 (HJ0001) Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SJ0006 (HJ0004) Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Commission – Atlantic Menhaden – Population Evaluation and Prohibition on Commercial Reduction Fishing Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/26/2021 4:42 PM
Click to return on the top page