Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Flags

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0001
Title
Motor Vehicles - Special Registration Plates - Confederate Battle Flag
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0177 /CH0617
Title
Criminal Law - Prohibition on Marking Flags - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0303 (SB0026)
Title
State Designations - State Tartan
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0391 (SB0020)
Title
State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0020 (HB0391)
Title
State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0026 (HB0303)
Title
State Designations - State Tartan
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0986 (HB0985)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Olney Theatre Center
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0001 Motor Vehicles - Special Registration Plates - Confederate Battle Flag Delegate Barve 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2016 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0177 /CH0617 Criminal Law - Prohibition on Marking Flags - Repeal Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 617
Judiciary
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0303 (SB0026) State Designations - State Tartan Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0391 (SB0020) State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0020 (HB0391) State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0026 (HB0303) State Designations - State Tartan Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0986 (HB0985) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Olney Theatre Center Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 3:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM