Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Flood Control

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0031 (SB0057)
Title
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0082
Title
Stormwater Management - Assessment of Local Fees, Charges, and Excise Taxes - Leasehold Interests
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0178
Title
Natural Resources - Roadside Trees - Preservation and Protection
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0415 (SB0419)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Downs Park Amphitheater
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0880
Title
Public Safety - Demolition Work - Safety Provisions and Permitting
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1108
Title
Environment - Municipal Stormwater Charges - Property Subject to Charges
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 (HB0031)
Title
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0419 (HB0415)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Downs Park Amphitheater
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0719
Title
Environment - Stormwater Remediation Fees - Municipalities
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0031 (SB0057) Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2016 Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0082 Stormwater Management - Assessment of Local Fees, Charges, and Excise Taxes - Leasehold Interests Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0178 Natural Resources - Roadside Trees - Preservation and Protection Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0415 (SB0419) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Downs Park Amphitheater Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 9:00 AM
HB0880 Public Safety - Demolition Work - Safety Provisions and Permitting Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1108 Environment - Municipal Stormwater Charges - Property Subject to Charges Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0057 (HB0031) Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2016 Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0419 (HB0415) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Downs Park Amphitheater Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 12:00 PM
SB0719 Environment - Stormwater Remediation Fees - Municipalities Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM