Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Flood Control

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0219 /CH0350 (SB1015)
Title
Prince George’s County – New Homes – Drainage Defects PG 408–19
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0410 (SB0267)
Title
Task Force on Prohibiting Debris From Entering Storm Drains or Stormwater Inlets
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0428 /CH0651 (SB0269/CH0652)
Title
Comprehensive Flood Management Grant Program – Awards for Flood Damage and Mandatory Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1403 (SB0741/CH0334)
Title
Maryland Historical Trust - Properties Subject to Historic Preservation Easements - Waiver Process
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1427 /CH0442
Title
Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0267 (HB0410)
Title
Task Force on Prohibiting Debris From Entering Storm Drains or Stormwater Inlets
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0269 /CH0652 (HB0428/CH0651)
Title
Comprehensive Flood Management Grant Program – Awards for Flood Damage and Mandatory Funding
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0741 /CH0334 (HB1403)
Title
Secretary of Planning – Adaptive Reuse of Historic Properties – Study
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1015 (HB0219/CH0350)
Title
Prince George's County - New Homes - Correction of Drainage Defects PG 408-19
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0219 /CH0350 (SB1015) Prince George’s County – New Homes – Drainage Defects PG 408–19 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0410 (SB0267) Task Force on Prohibiting Debris From Entering Storm Drains or Stormwater Inlets Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0428 /CH0651 (SB0269/CH0652) Comprehensive Flood Management Grant Program – Awards for Flood Damage and Mandatory Funding Delegate Watson, C. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 651
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1403 (SB0741/CH0334) Maryland Historical Trust - Properties Subject to Historic Preservation Easements - Waiver Process Delegate Kittleman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1427 /CH0442 Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0267 (HB0410) Task Force on Prohibiting Debris From Entering Storm Drains or Stormwater Inlets Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0269 /CH0652 (HB0428/CH0651) Comprehensive Flood Management Grant Program – Awards for Flood Damage and Mandatory Funding Senator Hester 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 652
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Appropriations
SB0741 /CH0334 (HB1403) Secretary of Planning – Adaptive Reuse of Historic Properties – Study Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1015 (HB0219/CH0350) Prince George's County - New Homes - Correction of Drainage Defects PG 408-19 Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:24 PM