Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Food Stamps

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0580 (SB0250)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Prohibited Lease Provisions - Late Fees for Tenants Receiving Government Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1273 (SB0513)
Title
Food Stamp Program - Time Limit Waiver - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1432
Title
Food Stamp Program - Summer Supplement for Children - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1729 (SB1164)
Title
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0513 (HB1273)
Title
Food Stamp Program - Time Limit Waiver - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1034
Title
Human Services – State Public Assistance Eligibility – Arrest Warrant
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1164 (HB1729)
Title
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0580 (SB0250) Landlord and Tenant - Prohibited Lease Provisions - Late Fees for Tenants Receiving Government Benefits Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1273 (SB0513) Food Stamp Program - Time Limit Waiver - Prohibition Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/15/2018 - 3:00 PM
HB1432 Food Stamp Program - Summer Supplement for Children - Pilot Program Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1729 (SB1164) Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Funding Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0513 (HB1273) Food Stamp Program - Time Limit Waiver - Prohibition Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1034 Human Services – State Public Assistance Eligibility – Arrest Warrant Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1164 (HB1729) Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Funding Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2018 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM