Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Food Stamps

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0226 (SB0550)
Title
Food Stamp Program - Minimum Benefit for Disabled Individuals - State Supplement
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0338 /CH0635 (SB0218/CH0636)
Title
Human Services - Food Supplements (Summer SNAP for Children Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0339 (SB0456)
Title
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0506 /CH0478 (SB0970/CH0477)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, Infants, and Children - Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0677
Title
Human Services - Food Assistance Program - Continuity of Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0838 /CH0475 (SB0752)
Title
Food Supplement Program - Restaurant Meals Program
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0957
Title
Food Stamp Program - Time Limit Waiver - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0218 /CH0636 (HB0338/CH0635)
Title
Human Services - Food Supplements (Summer SNAP for Children Act)
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0456 (HB0339)
Title
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0550 (HB0226)
Title
Food Stamp Program - Minimum Benefit for Disabled Individuals - State Supplement
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0752 (HB0838/CH0475)
Title
Food Supplement Program - Restaurant Meals Program
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0970 /CH0477 (HB0506/CH0478)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, Infants, and Children - Reports
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0226 (SB0550) Food Stamp Program - Minimum Benefit for Disabled Individuals - State Supplement Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0338 /CH0635 (SB0218/CH0636) Human Services - Food Supplements (Summer SNAP for Children Act) Delegate Queen 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 635
Appropriations
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0339 (SB0456) Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Funding Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0506 /CH0478 (SB0970/CH0477) Maryland Department of Health - Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, Infants, and Children - Reports Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Appropriations
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0677 Human Services - Food Assistance Program - Continuity of Benefits Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0838 /CH0475 (SB0752) Food Supplement Program - Restaurant Meals Program Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Appropriations
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0957 Food Stamp Program - Time Limit Waiver - Prohibition Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0218 /CH0636 (HB0338/CH0635) Human Services - Food Supplements (Summer SNAP for Children Act) Senator McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 636
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0456 (HB0339) Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Funding Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0550 (HB0226) Food Stamp Program - Minimum Benefit for Disabled Individuals - State Supplement Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0752 (HB0838/CH0475) Food Supplement Program - Restaurant Meals Program Senator Lam 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0970 /CH0477 (HB0506/CH0478) Maryland Department of Health - Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, Infants, and Children - Reports Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 477
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:24 PM