Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Foreclosure

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0125
Title
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Attorney's Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Stukes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0286 /CH0449 (SB0161/CH0448)
Title
Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Foreclosure of Liens
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0518
Title
Tax Sales - Redemption of Property - Payments and Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Stukes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0628
Title
Real Property - Maryland Contract Lien Act - Monetary Judgments
Sponsor
Delegate Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0811
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosure of Liens by Common Ownership Communities
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1008
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure - Mortgage Foreclosure Property Values Protection Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1147
Title
Residential Property Foreclosure Procedures - Required Documents - Request for Waiver of Mediation Filing Fee
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1308 /CH0515 (SB0642/CH0514)
Title
Residential Property - Prohibition on Nonjudicial Evictions
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0161 /CH0448 (HB0286/CH0449)
Title
Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Foreclosure of Liens
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0642 /CH0514 (HB1308/CH0515)
Title
Residential Property - Prohibition on Nonjudicial Evictions
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0125 Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Attorney's Fees Delegate Stukes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0286 /CH0449 (SB0161/CH0448) Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Foreclosure of Liens Delegate Niemann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 449
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0518 Tax Sales - Redemption of Property - Payments and Fees Delegate Stukes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0628 Real Property - Maryland Contract Lien Act - Monetary Judgments Delegate Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0811 Residential Property - Foreclosure of Liens by Common Ownership Communities Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1008 Real Property - Foreclosure - Mortgage Foreclosure Property Values Protection Act of 2013 Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1147 Residential Property Foreclosure Procedures - Required Documents - Request for Waiver of Mediation Filing Fee Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1308 /CH0515 (SB0642/CH0514) Residential Property - Prohibition on Nonjudicial Evictions Delegate Healey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Environmental Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0161 /CH0448 (HB0286/CH0449) Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Foreclosure of Liens Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0642 /CH0514 (HB1308/CH0515) Residential Property - Prohibition on Nonjudicial Evictions Senator Muse 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM