Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Foreclosure

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0274 /CH0592 (SB0708)
Title
Residential Property - Statute of Limitations for Certain Specialties and Motion for Certain Deficiency Judgments
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0446 /CH0599
Title
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Attorney's Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Stukes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0595 /CH0233
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure of Residential Property - Certified Community Development Financial Institutions
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0602 /CH0603
Title
Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Foreclosure of Liens
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0940
Title
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Stukes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1012
Title
Prince George's County - Property Tax Credit - Qualified Residential Property PG 414-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1021
Title
Prince George's County - Foreclosure - Report by Department of Housing and Community Development and Commissioner of Financial Regulation PG 411-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1319
Title
Real Property - Foreclosures - Deficiency Judgments Prohibited and Definition of "Secured Party" (Foreclosure Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Mizeur
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1322 (SB0755)
Title
Foreclosure - Moratorium, Notices, Penalties, Redemption Period, and Study
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1527
Title
Real Property - Bankruptcy Proceedings - Expedited Foreclosure Timeline
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708 (HB0274/CH0592)
Title
Residential Property - Statute of Limitations for Certain Specialties and Motion for Certain Deficiency Judgments
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0755 (HB1322)
Title
Foreclosure - Moratorium, Notices, Penalties, Redemption Period, and Study
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0274 /CH0592 (SB0708) Residential Property - Statute of Limitations for Certain Specialties and Motion for Certain Deficiency Judgments Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 592
Environmental Matters
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0446 /CH0599 Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Attorney's Fees Delegate Stukes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 599
Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 PM
HB0595 /CH0233 Real Property - Foreclosure of Residential Property - Certified Community Development Financial Institutions Delegate Niemann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0602 /CH0603 Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Foreclosure of Liens Delegate Niemann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 603
Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0940 Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses Delegate Stukes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1012 Prince George's County - Property Tax Credit - Qualified Residential Property PG 414-14 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1021 Prince George's County - Foreclosure - Report by Department of Housing and Community Development and Commissioner of Financial Regulation PG 411-14 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environmental Matters
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1319 Real Property - Foreclosures - Deficiency Judgments Prohibited and Definition of "Secured Party" (Foreclosure Protection Act) Delegate Mizeur 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1322 (SB0755) Foreclosure - Moratorium, Notices, Penalties, Redemption Period, and Study Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1527 Real Property - Bankruptcy Proceedings - Expedited Foreclosure Timeline Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0708 (HB0274/CH0592) Residential Property - Statute of Limitations for Certain Specialties and Motion for Certain Deficiency Judgments Senator Raskin 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0755 (HB1322) Foreclosure - Moratorium, Notices, Penalties, Redemption Period, and Study Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM