Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Foreclosure

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0511 /CH0428
Title
Real Property - Residential Property - Ground Leases
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0607
Title
Prince George's County - Property Tax - Transforming Neighborhood Initiative Residential Rehabilitation Tax Credit PG 414-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0840
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure - Prohibition on Deficiency Judgment
Sponsor
Delegate Knotts
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0929 (SB0756)
Title
Prince George's County - Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015 PG 423-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0935 /CH0289
Title
Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 410-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1035 /CH0114 (SB0439)
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1144
Title
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1168
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure - Residential Property - Prefile Mediation
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1177
Title
Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 425-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1178 /CH0301
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemption - Purchase Money Mortgage or Purchase Money Deed of Trust
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1184 (SB0835)
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure Moratorium and Study (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015)
Sponsor
Delegate Knotts
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1195 (SB0877)
Title
Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1197 (SB0875)
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure - Owner-Occupied Residential Property - Prohibition on Collection of Deficiency
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1215 (SB0876)
Title
Foreclosure - Indorsement of Debt Instrument, Lost Note Affidavit, and Penalties for False Statements
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0439 (HB1035/CH0114)
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0756 (HB0929)
Title
Prince George's County - Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0783
Title
Foreclosure Sales of Residential Property - Motion for Deficiency Judgment
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0835 (HB1184)
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure Moratorium and Study (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015)
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0875 (HB1197)
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure - Owner-Occupied Residential Property - Prohibition on Collection of Deficiency
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0876 (HB1215)
Title
Foreclosure - Indorsement of Debt Instrument, Lost Note Affidavit, and Penalties for False Statements
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 (HB1195)
Title
Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0511 /CH0428 Real Property - Residential Property - Ground Leases Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0607 Prince George's County - Property Tax - Transforming Neighborhood Initiative Residential Rehabilitation Tax Credit PG 414-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0840 Real Property - Foreclosure - Prohibition on Deficiency Judgment Delegate Knotts 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0929 (SB0756) Prince George's County - Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015 PG 423-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0935 /CH0289 Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 410-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Ways and Means
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1035 /CH0114 (SB0439) Baltimore City - Tax Sales Delegate Oaks 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1144 Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1168 Real Property - Foreclosure - Residential Property - Prefile Mediation Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1177 Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 425-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1178 /CH0301 Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemption - Purchase Money Mortgage or Purchase Money Deed of Trust Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1184 (SB0835) Real Property - Foreclosure Moratorium and Study (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015) Delegate Knotts 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1195 (SB0877) Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015 Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1197 (SB0875) Real Property - Foreclosure - Owner-Occupied Residential Property - Prohibition on Collection of Deficiency Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1215 (SB0876) Foreclosure - Indorsement of Debt Instrument, Lost Note Affidavit, and Penalties for False Statements Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0439 (HB1035/CH0114) Baltimore City - Tax Sales Senator McFadden 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0756 (HB0929) Prince George's County - Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015 Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Rosapepe)
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0783 Foreclosure Sales of Residential Property - Motion for Deficiency Judgment Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0835 (HB1184) Real Property - Foreclosure Moratorium and Study (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015) Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0875 (HB1197) Real Property - Foreclosure - Owner-Occupied Residential Property - Prohibition on Collection of Deficiency Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0876 (HB1215) Foreclosure - Indorsement of Debt Instrument, Lost Note Affidavit, and Penalties for False Statements Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0877 (HB1195) Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015 Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM
Click to return on the top page