Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Foreclosure

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0508 (SB0330)
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosure Sale - Recordation of Instrument of Writing
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0524
Title
Foreclosure - Responsibility for Maintenance of Residential Property and Registration Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0538
Title
Real Property - Notices of Foreclosure Sale and Postponement or Cancellation of Foreclosure Sale
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0664
Title
Foreclosures - Responsibility for Maintenance of Residential Property and Registration Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0684 /CH0029 (SB0558)
Title
Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - Codified
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0712
Title
Foreclosures - Baltimore County - Certificate of Vacancy or Certificate of Property Unfit for Human Habitation
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0762
Title
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0970 /CH0566 (SB0591/CH0565)
Title
Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1153
Title
Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 431-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1171
Title
Foreclosed Property Registry - Responsibility for Maintenance of Residential Property, Registration Requirement, and Access to Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1192 /CH0735 (SB0816)
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Resales - Disclosures and Fees
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1274 (SB0836)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1286
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosed Property Registry - Notification to Local Jurisdictions
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1377
Title
Real Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited Foreclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0330 (HB0508)
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosure Sale - Recordation of Instrument of Writing
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0456
Title
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0558 (HB0684/CH0029)
Title
Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - Codified
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0591 /CH0565 (HB0970/CH0566)
Title
Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association Fees
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0816 (HB1192/CH0735)
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Resales - Disclosures and Fees
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0836 (HB1274)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0508 (SB0330) Residential Property - Foreclosure Sale - Recordation of Instrument of Writing Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0524 Foreclosure - Responsibility for Maintenance of Residential Property and Registration Requirement Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0538 Real Property - Notices of Foreclosure Sale and Postponement or Cancellation of Foreclosure Sale Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0664 Foreclosures - Responsibility for Maintenance of Residential Property and Registration Requirement Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0684 /CH0029 (SB0558) Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - Codified Delegate Hammen 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 29
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0712 Foreclosures - Baltimore County - Certificate of Vacancy or Certificate of Property Unfit for Human Habitation Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0762 Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0970 /CH0566 (SB0591/CH0565) Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association Fees Delegate Reznik 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 566
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1153 Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 431-16 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2016 - 2:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1171 Foreclosed Property Registry - Responsibility for Maintenance of Residential Property, Registration Requirement, and Access to Registry Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1192 /CH0735 (SB0816) Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Resales - Disclosures and Fees Delegate McMillan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 735
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1274 (SB0836) Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1286 Residential Property - Foreclosed Property Registry - Notification to Local Jurisdictions Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1377 Real Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited Foreclosure Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0330 (HB0508) Residential Property - Foreclosure Sale - Recordation of Instrument of Writing Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0456 Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Budget and Taxation
SB0558 (HB0684/CH0029) Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - Codified Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0591 /CH0565 (HB0970/CH0566) Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association Fees Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2016 - 3:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0816 (HB1192/CH0735) Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Resales - Disclosures and Fees Senator Muse 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0836 (HB1274) Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM