Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Foreclosure

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0078 /CH0348 (SB0222/CH0349)
Title
Foreclosed Property Registry - Updated Information - Notice to Local Governments
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0085
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Foreclosed Property Registry - Access
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0182
Title
Prince George's County - Vacant and Abandoned Residential Property - Foreclosure PG 404-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0266
Title
Condominiums - Lien Priority - Unpaid Water and Sewer Charges
Sponsor
Delegate Rey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0279 /CH0104
Title
Housing and Community Development - Homebuyer Education Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1246 (SB0954)
Title
Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1263
Title
Foreclosed Property Registry - Duty to Inspect and Maintain Properties in Baltimore City
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0095
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Voting, Records, and Conflicts of Interest
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0222 /CH0349 (HB0078/CH0348)
Title
Foreclosed Property Registry - Updated Information - Notice to Local Governments
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0954 (HB1246)
Title
Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0078 /CH0348 (SB0222/CH0349) Foreclosed Property Registry - Updated Information - Notice to Local Governments Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348
Environment and Transportation
1/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0085 Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Foreclosed Property Registry - Access Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
1/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0182 Prince George's County - Vacant and Abandoned Residential Property - Foreclosure PG 404-18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0266 Condominiums - Lien Priority - Unpaid Water and Sewer Charges Delegate Rey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0279 /CH0104 Housing and Community Development - Homebuyer Education Requirements Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1246 (SB0954) Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1263 Foreclosed Property Registry - Duty to Inspect and Maintain Properties in Baltimore City Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0095 Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Voting, Records, and Conflicts of Interest Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0222 /CH0349 (HB0078/CH0348) Foreclosed Property Registry - Updated Information - Notice to Local Governments Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0954 (HB1246) Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM