Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Foreign Ownership

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0135
Title
Annual Reports and Personal Property Reports - Fees, Exemption, and Affidavit
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0188 /CH0478
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Disclosure and Sharing of Information
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0201
Title
Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Resident Agent and Company Representative
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1314 (SB0772)
Title
Financial Institutions - Single-Party and Multiple-Party Accounts - Right to Funds on Death of a Party
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1513 (SB1056)
Title
Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by Merger
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1544 (SB1065)
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0420
Title
Election Law - Ballot Issues - Contributions or Donations by Foreign Nationals
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0772 (HB1314)
Title
Financial Institutions - Single-Party and Multiple-Party Accounts - Right to Funds on Death of a Party
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1056 (HB1513)
Title
Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by Merger
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1065 (HB1544)
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0135 Annual Reports and Personal Property Reports - Fees, Exemption, and Affidavit Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0188 /CH0478 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Disclosure and Sharing of Information Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Economic Matters
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0201 Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Resident Agent and Company Representative Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB1314 (SB0772) Financial Institutions - Single-Party and Multiple-Party Accounts - Right to Funds on Death of a Party Speaker 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1513 (SB1056) Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by Merger Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1544 (SB1065) Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0420 Election Law - Ballot Issues - Contributions or Donations by Foreign Nationals Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0772 (HB1314) Financial Institutions - Single-Party and Multiple-Party Accounts - Right to Funds on Death of a Party President 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB1056 (HB1513) Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by Merger Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1065 (HB1544) Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM