Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Foreign Ownership

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0891
Title
Foreign Corporations - Resident Agents - State Department of Assessments and Taxation
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0983 /CH0400 (SB0888/CH0401)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies and Partnerships - Series - Conversion
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1398 /CH0463
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0024
Title
Small Business Fairness Act
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0115 /CH0529
Title
Annual and Personal Property Reports - Submission
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0742
Title
Labor and Employment - Fair Recruitment and Transparency Act
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0888 /CH0401 (HB0983/CH0400)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies and Partnerships - Series - Conversion
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0891 Foreign Corporations - Resident Agents - State Department of Assessments and Taxation Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Economic Matters
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0983 /CH0400 (SB0888/CH0401) Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies and Partnerships - Series - Conversion Delegate Dumais 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 400
Economic Matters
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1398 /CH0463 Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications Delegate Arentz 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 463
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0024 Small Business Fairness Act Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/09/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0115 /CH0529 Annual and Personal Property Reports - Submission Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 529
Budget and Taxation
1/09/2020 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0742 Labor and Employment - Fair Recruitment and Transparency Act Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0888 /CH0401 (HB0983/CH0400) Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies and Partnerships - Series - Conversion Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 401
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 3:45 PM