Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Foreign Trade -see also- International Affairs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0434 (SB0693)
Title
Personal Property Tax Reports - Electronic Filing
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0938
Title
Health - General - Poultry Processed in the People's Republic of China - Notice Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0146
Title
Business and Economic Development - Foreign Trade Zones - Information
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0693 (HB0434)
Title
Personal Property Tax Returns - Electronic Filing
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0434 (SB0693) Personal Property Tax Reports - Electronic Filing Delegate Arora 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0938 Health - General - Poultry Processed in the People's Republic of China - Notice Requirements Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0146 Business and Economic Development - Foreign Trade Zones - Information Senator Reilly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Finance
1/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0693 (HB0434) Personal Property Tax Returns - Electronic Filing Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM