Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Foreign Trade -see also- International Affairs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0457 (SB0385)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0519 (SB0903)
Title
Courts - Statute of Limitations - Civil Actions Arising Out of Human Rights Abuses
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0622
Title
Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Expansion of International Market Presence - Feasibility Study
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1419 (SB0034)
Title
Corporations and Business Entities - Filing Fees and Combined Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0034 (HB1419)
Title
Corporations and Business Entities - Filing Fees and Combined Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0066 /CH0335
Title
Professional Corporations - Approval of Corporate Name by Licensing Unit and Professional Organization - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0385 (HB0457)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0903 (HB0519)
Title
Courts - Statute of Limitations - Civil Actions Arising Out of Human Rights Abuses
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0457 (SB0385) Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0519 (SB0903) Courts - Statute of Limitations - Civil Actions Arising Out of Human Rights Abuses Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0622 Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Expansion of International Market Presence - Feasibility Study Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1419 (SB0034) Corporations and Business Entities - Filing Fees and Combined Reporting Delegate Platt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0034 (HB1419) Corporations and Business Entities - Filing Fees and Combined Reporting Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0066 /CH0335 Professional Corporations - Approval of Corporate Name by Licensing Unit and Professional Organization - Exemption Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0385 (HB0457) Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0903 (HB0519) Courts - Statute of Limitations - Civil Actions Arising Out of Human Rights Abuses Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM