Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Foreign Trade -see also- International Affairs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0842 (SB0227)
Title
Small Business Fairness Act of 2018
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1322 (SB0166)
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Federal Repatriation Holiday
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1556
Title
Public-Private Partnerships - Public Notice of Solicitations and Approval of Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1794 /CH0342
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0166 (HB1322)
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Federal Repatriation Holiday
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0227 (HB0842)
Title
Small Business Fairness Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1090 /CH0341
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0842 (SB0227) Small Business Fairness Act of 2018 Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1322 (SB0166) Corporate Income Tax - Federal Repatriation Holiday Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1556 Public-Private Partnerships - Public Notice of Solicitations and Approval of Agreements Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1794 /CH0342 Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Ways and Means
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0166 (HB1322) Corporate Income Tax - Federal Repatriation Holiday Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0227 (HB0842) Small Business Fairness Act of 2018 Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2018 - 1:30 PM
SB1090 /CH0341 Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM