Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Forests and Parks -see also- Program Open Space; Trees

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0068
Title
North Point State Park - Deer Bow Hunting Season - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0090
Title
St. Mary's County - Agricultural Land Preservation Program - Installment Purchase Agreements - Repeal
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0173
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0203 (SB0614)
Title
Community Parks and Playgrounds Program - Baltimore County and Howard County - Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0645 (SB0461)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0687 (SB0597)
Title
Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Fixed Natural Filter Practices
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1015
Title
Montgomery County - Land Use Documents - Certification PG/MC 104-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1025
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Summer Math, Reading, and Science Pilot Program PG/MC 108-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1098
Title
Use of Public Funds – Playground and Athletic Field Surfaces – Authorizations, Preferences, and Prohibitions (Safe and Healthy Fields Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1146
Title
Forest Conservation - Mel Noland Woodland Incentives Fund - Distribution of Agricultural Land Transfer Tax Revenue
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385
Title
Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1400
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1467
Title
Calvert County - Criminal Law - Refusal or Failure to Leave Public Building or Grounds
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1604
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0352
Title
Somerset County - Tax Exemption for Manufacturing Property - Duration
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0461 (HB0645)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0597 (HB0687)
Title
Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Fixed Natural Filter Practices
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0614 (HB0203)
Title
Community Parks and Playgrounds Program - Baltimore County and Howard County - Expansion
Sponsor
Baltimore County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0962
Title
Community Parks and Playgrounds Program - Baltimore County and Howard County - Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0979
Title
Income Tax Credit - Value-Added Processing Expenses
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0987
Title
Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0068 North Point State Park - Deer Bow Hunting Season - Establishment Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0090 St. Mary's County - Agricultural Land Preservation Program - Installment Purchase Agreements - Repeal St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0173 Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0203 (SB0614) Community Parks and Playgrounds Program - Baltimore County and Howard County - Expansion Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0645 (SB0461) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0687 (SB0597) Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Fixed Natural Filter Practices Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1015 Montgomery County - Land Use Documents - Certification PG/MC 104-20 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1025 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Summer Math, Reading, and Science Pilot Program PG/MC 108-20 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1098 Use of Public Funds – Playground and Athletic Field Surfaces – Authorizations, Preferences, and Prohibitions (Safe and Healthy Fields Act) Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1146 Forest Conservation - Mel Noland Woodland Incentives Fund - Distribution of Agricultural Land Transfer Tax Revenue Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1385 Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1400 Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1467 Calvert County - Criminal Law - Refusal or Failure to Leave Public Building or Grounds Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1604 Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0352 Somerset County - Tax Exemption for Manufacturing Property - Duration Senator Carozza 2 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0461 (HB0645) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0597 (HB0687) Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Fixed Natural Filter Practices Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0614 (HB0203) Community Parks and Playgrounds Program - Baltimore County and Howard County - Expansion Baltimore County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0962 Community Parks and Playgrounds Program - Baltimore County and Howard County - Expansion Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0979 Income Tax Credit - Value-Added Processing Expenses Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0987 Racing and Community Development Act of 2020 Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/19/2020 12:08 PM