Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Forfeiture

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0713 /CH0636
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1225
Title
Criminal Law - Drive-By Shooting - Forfeiture of Motor Vehicle
Sponsor
Delegate Kach
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1264
Title
Task Force to Study Forfeiture of Retirement Benefits for Public Officials Charged with or Convicted of a Crime
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1453
Title
Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and Taxation
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0713 /CH0636 Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Human Trafficking Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636
Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1225 Criminal Law - Drive-By Shooting - Forfeiture of Motor Vehicle Delegate Kach 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1264 Task Force to Study Forfeiture of Retirement Benefits for Public Officials Charged with or Convicted of a Crime Delegate George 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1453 Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and Taxation Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM