Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Forfeiture

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0028 (SB0443)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Hidden Compartments - Prohibition and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0377
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services Employees - Forfeiture of Retirement Benefits for Criminal Conviction
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0880 (SB0658)
Title
Marijuana Control Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1126
Title
Criminal Law - Synthetic Marijuana - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Haddaway-Riccio
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1171
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Correctional, Police, and Law Enforcement Officers - Forfeiture of Retirement Benefits for Criminal Conviction
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0443 (HB0028)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Hidden Compartments - Prohibition and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0468
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0658 (HB0880)
Title
The Marijuana Taxation and Regulation Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0028 (SB0443) Vehicle Laws - Hidden Compartments - Prohibition and Penalties Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0377 State Retirement and Pension System - Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services Employees - Forfeiture of Retirement Benefits for Criminal Conviction Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0880 (SB0658) Marijuana Control Act of 2014 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1126 Criminal Law - Synthetic Marijuana - Prohibition Delegate Haddaway-Riccio 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1171 State Retirement and Pension System - Correctional, Police, and Law Enforcement Officers - Forfeiture of Retirement Benefits for Criminal Conviction Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0443 (HB0028) Vehicle Laws - Hidden Compartments - Prohibition and Penalties Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0468 Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Reporting Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0658 (HB0880) The Marijuana Taxation and Regulation Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM