Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Forfeiture

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0255
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0360 (SB0528)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0362 (SB0393)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0713
Title
Natural Resources - Trade in Ivory and Rhinoceros Horn - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0857 (SB0530)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911 (SB0531)
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1001
Title
Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Return of Defendant
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0165
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Constitutional Officers - Forfeiture of Benefits
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0393 (HB0362)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of Costs
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0528 (HB0360)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0530 (HB0857)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0531 (HB0911)
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0255 Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0360 (SB0528) Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture Delegate Vallario 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (87-51)
Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0362 (SB0393) Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of Costs Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
3/04/2015 - 1:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0713 Natural Resources - Trade in Ivory and Rhinoceros Horn - Prohibition Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/04/2015 - 1:15 PM
HB0857 (SB0530) Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0911 (SB0531) Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1001 Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Return of Defendant Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0165 State Retirement and Pension System - Constitutional Officers - Forfeiture of Benefits Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 8:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2015 - 8:30 AM
SB0393 (HB0362) Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of Costs Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0528 (HB0360) Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture Senator Raskin 2 2 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 5 of 2016
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0530 (HB0857) Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0531 (HB0911) Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015 Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM