Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Forfeiture

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0112 /CH0252
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Expenditures Made and the Attribution of Contributions Received
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0336 /CH0619 (SB0161/CH0658)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0372
Title
Criminal Law - Synthetic Drugs - Penalties
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0881 (SB0740)
Title
Business Regulation - Marketing Synthetic Drugs - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1212
Title
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Safer Drug Use Facility Program
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1267
Title
Poly-Morphone-Assisted Treatment Pilot Program - Harm Reduction Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1306
Title
Habitual Drunk Driver - Mandatory Minimum Penalty and Vehicle Forfeiture
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1446 /CH0653
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Recordation of Governing and Charter Documents - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1452 (SB0902)
Title
Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Marijuana
Sponsor
Delegate Vogt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1544 (SB1065)
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1580
Title
Marijuana CONTRol (Cannabis Oversight and Nondiscrimination through Taxation, Regulation, and Legalization) Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0161 /CH0658 (HB0336/CH0619)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0542 /CH0220
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Forfeiture of Benefits
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0633
Title
State Employees' Retirement Savings Plan
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0740 (HB0881)
Title
Business Regulation - Marketing Synthetic Drugs - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0902 (HB1452)
Title
Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Marijuana
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1065 (HB1544)
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0112 /CH0252 Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Expenditures Made and the Attribution of Contributions Received Delegate Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252
Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0336 /CH0619 (SB0161/CH0658) Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture Delegate Vallario 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 619
Judiciary
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0372 Criminal Law - Synthetic Drugs - Penalties Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0881 (SB0740) Business Regulation - Marketing Synthetic Drugs - Penalties Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1212 Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Safer Drug Use Facility Program Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1267 Poly-Morphone-Assisted Treatment Pilot Program - Harm Reduction Act of 2016 Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1306 Habitual Drunk Driver - Mandatory Minimum Penalty and Vehicle Forfeiture Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1446 /CH0653 State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Recordation of Governing and Charter Documents - Prohibitions Delegate McComas 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 653
Economic Matters
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1452 (SB0902) Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Marijuana Delegate Vogt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1544 (SB1065) Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1580 Marijuana CONTRol (Cannabis Oversight and Nondiscrimination through Taxation, Regulation, and Legalization) Act of 2016 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0161 /CH0658 (HB0336/CH0619) Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture Senator Hough 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0542 /CH0220 State Retirement and Pension System - Forfeiture of Benefits Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2016 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0633 State Employees' Retirement Savings Plan Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 8:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2016 - 8:30 AM
SB0740 (HB0881) Business Regulation - Marketing Synthetic Drugs - Penalties Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0902 (HB1452) Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Marijuana Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1065 (HB1544) Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM