Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Forfeiture

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0304 /CH0527 (SB0353/CH0528)
Title
Optional Retirement Program - Annuity Contracts - Employee Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0519
Title
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Safer Drug Consumption Facility Program
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0744 /CH0674 (SB0481)
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372
Title
Public Health - Ibogaine Treatment Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1482
Title
Health - Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, and Dispensary Licenses - Sale or Transfer and Forfeiture
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0353 /CH0528 (HB0304/CH0527)
Title
Optional Retirement Program - Annuity Contracts - Employee Rights
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0481 (HB0744/CH0674)
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0304 /CH0527 (SB0353/CH0528) Optional Retirement Program - Annuity Contracts - Employee Rights Delegate Barnes, B. 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 9:00 AM
HB0519 Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Safer Drug Consumption Facility Program Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0744 /CH0674 (SB0481) Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 674
Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1372 Public Health - Ibogaine Treatment Pilot Program Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1482 Health - Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, and Dispensary Licenses - Sale or Transfer and Forfeiture Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0353 /CH0528 (HB0304/CH0527) Optional Retirement Program - Annuity Contracts - Employee Rights Senator Guzzone 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2017 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0481 (HB0744/CH0674) Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Senator Feldman 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM