Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Forfeiture

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0326 (SB0288)
Title
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Supervised Drug Consumption Facility Program
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0631 /CH0540
Title
Somerset County - Fines and Forfeitures - Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0724 (SB0604)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Sponsor
Western Maryland Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1129 (SB0721)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture Proceedings - Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1276 (SB0881)
Title
Criminal Law – Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0288 (HB0326)
Title
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Supervised Drug Consumption Facility Program
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0604 (HB0724)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0721 (HB1129)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture Proceedings - Notice
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0881 (HB1276)
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0326 (SB0288) Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Supervised Drug Consumption Facility Program Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0631 /CH0540 Somerset County - Fines and Forfeitures - Distribution Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 540
Judiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0724 (SB0604) Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer Western Maryland Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1129 (SB0721) Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture Proceedings - Notice Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1276 (SB0881) Criminal Law – Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0288 (HB0326) Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Supervised Drug Consumption Facility Program Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0604 (HB0724) Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0721 (HB1129) Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture Proceedings - Notice Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0881 (HB1276) Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM