Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Forfeiture

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0045 (SB0092)
Title
Accountability in Education Act of 2019
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0135 /CH0061 (SB0152/CH0062)
Title
Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Payment of Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0139 (SB0135)
Title
Public Health – Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Site Program
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0218 /CH0232 (SB0147/CH0231)
Title
Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Forfeiture or Waiver of Right of Disposition
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0554
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture Proceedings - Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0656 (SB0771)
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0871 /CH0021 (SB0690/CH0022)
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1146 (SB0664)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0092 (HB0045)
Title
Accountability in Education Act of 2019
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0135 (HB0139)
Title
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Site Program
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0147 /CH0231 (HB0218/CH0232)
Title
Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Forfeiture or Waiver of Right of Disposition
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0152 /CH0062 (HB0135/CH0061)
Title
Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Payment of Costs
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0643 /CH0235
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture Proceeds - Appropriation Percentage and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0644
Title
Circuit Court Fines, Penalties, and Forfeitures - Funding - Drug Treatment and Education
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0664 (HB1146)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0690 /CH0022 (HB0871/CH0021)
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0764
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture - Equitable Sharing of Proceeds
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0771 (HB0656)
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0045 (SB0092) Accountability in Education Act of 2019 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0135 /CH0061 (SB0152/CH0062) Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Payment of Costs Delegate Moon 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Judiciary
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0139 (SB0135) Public Health – Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Site Program Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0218 /CH0232 (SB0147/CH0231) Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Forfeiture or Waiver of Right of Disposition Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2019 - 2:00 PM
Finance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0554 Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture Proceedings - Notice Delegate Malone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0656 (SB0771) Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0871 /CH0021 (SB0690/CH0022) Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses Delegate Pippy 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 21
Judiciary
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1146 (SB0664) Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 10:00 a.m.
Judiciary
2/25/2019 - 10:00 AM
SB0092 (HB0045) Accountability in Education Act of 2019 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0135 (HB0139) Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Site Program Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0147 /CH0231 (HB0218/CH0232) Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Forfeiture or Waiver of Right of Disposition Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Finance
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0152 /CH0062 (HB0135/CH0061) Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Payment of Costs Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0643 /CH0235 Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture Proceeds - Appropriation Percentage and Reporting Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 9:00 AM
Judiciary
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0644 Circuit Court Fines, Penalties, and Forfeitures - Funding - Drug Treatment and Education Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 9:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 9:00 AM
SB0664 (HB1146) Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer Senator Edwards 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0690 /CH0022 (HB0871/CH0021) Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 22
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0764 Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture - Equitable Sharing of Proceeds Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2019 - 9:30 AM
SB0771 (HB0656) Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM