Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Forfeiture

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0069
Title
Criminal Procedure - Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention - Reporting of Seizures and Forfeitures
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0360 (SB0283)
Title
Ethics and Accountability in Government Act
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0900 /CH0359 (SB0911/CH0360)
Title
Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1288 (SB0290)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0283 (HB0360)
Title
Ethics and Accountability in Government Act
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0290 (HB1288)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0069 Criminal Procedure - Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention - Reporting of Seizures and Forfeitures Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0360 (SB0283) Ethics and Accountability in Government Act Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0900 /CH0359 (SB0911/CH0360) Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications Delegate Miller 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 359
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1288 (SB0290) Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0283 (HB0360) Ethics and Accountability in Government Act President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0290 (HB1288) Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Senator Peters 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:31 PM