Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Foster Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0001 (SB0064/CH0468)
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Educational Stability
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0699 /CH0419
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Unreimbursed Expenses of Foster Parents
Sponsor
Delegate Murphy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1026 /CH0334 (SB0737/CH0333)
Title
Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1270 (SB0914)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1307 /CH0451
Title
Children in Out-of-Home Placement - Annual Notice of Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1324
Title
Maryland Youth Employment Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0064 /CH0468 (HB0001)
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Educational Stability
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0096 /CH0023
Title
Health Insurance - Conformity With and Implementation of the Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0144 /CH0039
Title
Family Law - Foster Care - Kinship Parent Age Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737 /CH0333 (HB1026/CH0334)
Title
Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0914 (HB1270)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1093
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Legal Services Delivery Organization to Provide State-Mandated Legal Services
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0001 (SB0064/CH0468) Children in Need of Assistance - Educational Stability Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
1/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0699 /CH0419 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Unreimbursed Expenses of Foster Parents Delegate Murphy 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1026 /CH0334 (SB0737/CH0333) Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Economic Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1270 (SB0914) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1307 /CH0451 Children in Out-of-Home Placement - Annual Notice of Benefits Delegate Wilson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451
Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1324 Maryland Youth Employment Act of 2014 Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0064 /CH0468 (HB0001) Children in Need of Assistance - Educational Stability Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0096 /CH0023 Health Insurance - Conformity With and Implementation of the Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 23
Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0144 /CH0039 Family Law - Foster Care - Kinship Parent Age Requirements Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0737 /CH0333 (HB1026/CH0334) Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Finance
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0914 (HB1270) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1093 State Finance and Procurement - Legal Services Delivery Organization to Provide State-Mandated Legal Services Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM