Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Foster Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0171 (SB0150/CH0326)
Title
Courts - Child Abuse and Neglect - Waiver of Reunification Efforts (Anayah's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0199
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Unreimbursed Expenses of Foster Parents - Child Placement Agency
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0439 (SB0685/CH0046)
Title
Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster Children
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0564 /CH0435
Title
State Personnel - Limits on Use of Leave for Birth, Adoption, Foster Placement, or Care of Child
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0575 (SB0524)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0642 (SB0508/CH0180)
Title
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and Subcontractors
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0643 (SB0567/CH0366)
Title
Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0788 (SB0669)
Title
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Orphans and Foster Care Recipients
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0858 (SB0141)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Former Foster Care Adolescents - Dental Care
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0141 (HB0858)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Former Foster Care Adolescents - Dental Care
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0150 /CH0326 (HB0171)
Title
Courts - Child Abuse and Neglect - Waiver of Reunification Efforts (Anayah's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0508 /CH0180 (HB0642)
Title
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and Subcontractors
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0524 (HB0575)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0567 /CH0366 (HB0643)
Title
Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - Report
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0609 (HB1022)
Title
State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0669 (HB0788)
Title
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Orphans and Foster Care Recipients
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0685 /CH0046 (HB0439)
Title
Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster Children
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0171 (SB0150/CH0326) Courts - Child Abuse and Neglect - Waiver of Reunification Efforts (Anayah's Law) Delegate Afzali 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Judiciary
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0199 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Unreimbursed Expenses of Foster Parents - Child Placement Agency Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0439 (SB0685/CH0046) Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster Children Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Judiciary
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0564 /CH0435 State Personnel - Limits on Use of Leave for Birth, Adoption, Foster Placement, or Care of Child Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435
Appropriations
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0575 (SB0524) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0642 (SB0508/CH0180) Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and Subcontractors Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0643 (SB0567/CH0366) Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - Report Delegate Zucker 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0788 (SB0669) Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Orphans and Foster Care Recipients Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0858 (SB0141) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Former Foster Care Adolescents - Dental Care Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0141 (HB0858) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Former Foster Care Adolescents - Dental Care Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0150 /CH0326 (HB0171) Courts - Child Abuse and Neglect - Waiver of Reunification Efforts (Anayah's Law) Senator Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 326
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0508 /CH0180 (HB0642) Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and Subcontractors Senator Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0524 (HB0575) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0567 /CH0366 (HB0643) Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - Report Senator Gladden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/08/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0609 (HB1022) State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Pilot Program Senator Brochin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0669 (HB0788) Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Orphans and Foster Care Recipients Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0685 /CH0046 (HB0439) Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster Children Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM