Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Foster Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0462 /CH0321 (SB0701/CH0320)
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0936
Title
Maryland State Parks - Foster Family Pass - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1197 (SB0797)
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Reporting - Definitions
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1207 /CH0492 (SB0085/CH0491)
Title
Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - Siblings
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0085 /CH0491 (HB1207/CH0492)
Title
Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - Siblings
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0701 /CH0320 (HB0462/CH0321)
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0797 (HB1197)
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Reporting - Definitions
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0462 /CH0321 (SB0701/CH0320) Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Alterations Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0936 Maryland State Parks - Foster Family Pass - Establishment Delegate Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1197 (SB0797) Child Abuse and Neglect - Reporting - Definitions Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1207 /CH0492 (SB0085/CH0491) Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - Siblings Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 492
Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0085 /CH0491 (HB1207/CH0492) Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - Siblings Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 491
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0701 /CH0320 (HB0462/CH0321) Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Alterations Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0797 (HB1197) Child Abuse and Neglect - Reporting - Definitions Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM