Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Foster Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0049
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Foster Care Month
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0052
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Foster Youth Legislative Shadow Days
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0431 /CH0379 (SB0308/CH0380)
Title
Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Employment Program (Fostering Employment Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0787 /CH0827 (SB0629/CH0828)
Title
Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical Care
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1582 /CH0407
Title
Human Services - Children Receiving Child Welfare Services - Centralized Comprehensive Health Care Monitoring Program
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0085 /CH0369
Title
Tuition Waivers - Foster Care Recipients - Eligibility
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0308 /CH0380 (HB0431/CH0379)
Title
Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Employment Program (Fostering Employment Act of 2018)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0412
Title
Task Force on Baltimore City Department of Social Services Oversight
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0629 /CH0828 (HB0787/CH0827)
Title
Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical Care
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787 /CH0418
Title
Children in Out-of-Home Placement - Rights
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0049 General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Foster Care Month Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0052 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Foster Youth Legislative Shadow Days Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0431 /CH0379 (SB0308/CH0380) Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Employment Program (Fostering Employment Act of 2018) Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Appropriations
2/15/2018 - 3:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0787 /CH0827 (SB0629/CH0828) Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical Care Delegate Dumais 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 827
Judiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1582 /CH0407 Human Services - Children Receiving Child Welfare Services - Centralized Comprehensive Health Care Monitoring Program Delegate Wilson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0085 /CH0369 Tuition Waivers - Foster Care Recipients - Eligibility Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0308 /CH0380 (HB0431/CH0379) Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Employment Program (Fostering Employment Act of 2018) President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Finance
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 PM
SB0412 Task Force on Baltimore City Department of Social Services Oversight Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0629 /CH0828 (HB0787/CH0827) Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical Care Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 828
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0787 /CH0418 Children in Out-of-Home Placement - Rights Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM