Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Foster Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1212 /CH0077 (SB0024/CH0078)
Title
Family Law - Kinship Caregivers
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0024 /CH0078 (HB1212/CH0077)
Title
Family Law - Kinship Caregivers
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1043 /CH0497
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Qualified Residential Treatment Programs (Family First Prevention Services Act)
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1212 /CH0077 (SB0024/CH0078) Family Law - Kinship Caregivers Delegate McComas 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 77
Judiciary
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0024 /CH0078 (HB1212/CH0077) Family Law - Kinship Caregivers Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Judicial Proceedings
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB1043 /CH0497 Children in Need of Assistance - Qualified Residential Treatment Programs (Family First Prevention Services Act) Senator Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM