Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Franchise Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0919 (SB0902)
Title
Coal - Tax Credits and Exemption - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0969 (SB0865)
Title
Public Service Company Franchise Tax - Credit for Purchase of Maryland-Mined Coal - Extension
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1567 (SB0715)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing Development Credit Program
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0311
Title
Corporate Tax Fairness Act of 2020
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0715 (HB1567)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing Development Credit Program
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0865 (HB0969)
Title
Public Service Company Franchise Tax - Credit for Purchase of Maryland-Mined Coal - Extension
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0902 (HB0919)
Title
Coal – Tax Credits and Exemption – Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0919 (SB0902) Coal - Tax Credits and Exemption - Repeal Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0969 (SB0865) Public Service Company Franchise Tax - Credit for Purchase of Maryland-Mined Coal - Extension Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1567 (SB0715) Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing Development Credit Program Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0311 Corporate Tax Fairness Act of 2020 Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0715 (HB1567) Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing Development Credit Program Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0865 (HB0969) Public Service Company Franchise Tax - Credit for Purchase of Maryland-Mined Coal - Extension Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0902 (HB0919) Coal – Tax Credits and Exemption – Repeal Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/17/2020 9:15 AM