Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fuel -see also- Coal

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0449 /CH0481 (SB0409/CH0480)
Title
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0458
Title
Environment - Exploration and Production Waste and Waste From Hydraulic Fracturing
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0508
Title
Gas and Electricity - Analog Meters - Purchase and Installation
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0516 (SB0009)
Title
Gas and Electricity - Smart Meters - Customer Rights and Required Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0928
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Agricultural Products and Equipment - Repeal of Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1073
Title
Environment - Crude Oil Rail Transport - Risk Assessment and Accident Prevention Study
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1096
Title
Agriculture - Weight and Measure Requirements - Exemption for Biodiesel Purchasing Cooperative
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0009 (HB0516)
Title
Gas and Electricity - Smart Meters - Customer Rights and Required Reports
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0029
Title
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0035
Title
Baltimore County - Miscellaneous Business Licenses - Fees
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0458
Title
Civil Actions - Hydraulic Fracturing Liability Act
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0712
Title
Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact Account
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0449 /CH0481 (SB0409/CH0480) Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Regulations Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 481
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0458 Environment - Exploration and Production Waste and Waste From Hydraulic Fracturing Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0508 Gas and Electricity - Analog Meters - Purchase and Installation Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0516 (SB0009) Gas and Electricity - Smart Meters - Customer Rights and Required Reports Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0928 Sales and Use Tax - Agricultural Products and Equipment - Repeal of Exemption Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1073 Environment - Crude Oil Rail Transport - Risk Assessment and Accident Prevention Study Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1096 Agriculture - Weight and Measure Requirements - Exemption for Biodiesel Purchasing Cooperative Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0009 (HB0516) Gas and Electricity - Smart Meters - Customer Rights and Required Reports Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0029 Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibitions Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0035 Baltimore County - Miscellaneous Business Licenses - Fees Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0458 Civil Actions - Hydraulic Fracturing Liability Act Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0712 Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact Account Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM