Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fuel -see also- Coal

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0055 /CH0238 (SB0054)
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0296
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Warehouse Shopping Clubs - Beer or Wine Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0356
Title
Public Service Commission - Rates for Gas and Electricity - Discount for Qualified Residential Customers in Baltimore City
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0414 (SB0355/CH0388)
Title
Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0588
Title
Income Tax Credit - Fueling Stations - Electric Vehicle Charging and Natural Gas Vehicle Refueling Equipment
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0956
Title
Business Regulation - Motor Fuel Retail Service Station - Attendant Required
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0969
Title
Suspension of Driving Privileges - Dispensing Motor Fuel Into Dirt Bike
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1325 /CH0013 (SB0740)
Title
Oil and Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1406
Title
Gas and Electricity - Smart Meters - Customer Rights and Required Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1419
Title
Gas and Electricity - Analog Meters - Purchase and Installation
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1434
Title
Business Regulation - Marina Fuel Sales - Fuel Sales
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1473 (SB1082)
Title
Gas and Electric Companies - Deposit Charges
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1533 (SB0658)
Title
Termination of Electric or Gas Service - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0054 (HB0055/CH0238)
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0158 /CH0390
Title
Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup Fund
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0355 /CH0388 (HB0414)
Title
Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation Costs
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0658 (HB1533)
Title
Termination of Electric or Gas Service - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0740 (HB1325/CH0013)
Title
Oil and Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0847
Title
Retail Service Station Dealers - Gas Prices - Required Signage
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0980 (HB1461)
Title
Environment - Natural Gas and Oil Interest Restitution Fund
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1082 (HB1473)
Title
Gas and Electric Companies - Deposit Charges
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0055 /CH0238 (SB0054) Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition Delegate Jameson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Ways and Means
2/07/2017 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0296 Alcoholic Beverages - Warehouse Shopping Clubs - Beer or Wine Licenses Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0356 Public Service Commission - Rates for Gas and Electricity - Discount for Qualified Residential Customers in Baltimore City Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0414 (SB0355/CH0388) Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation Costs Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Economic Matters
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0588 Income Tax Credit - Fueling Stations - Electric Vehicle Charging and Natural Gas Vehicle Refueling Equipment Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0956 Business Regulation - Motor Fuel Retail Service Station - Attendant Required Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0969 Suspension of Driving Privileges - Dispensing Motor Fuel Into Dirt Bike Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1325 /CH0013 (SB0740) Oil and Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1406 Gas and Electricity - Smart Meters - Customer Rights and Required Reports Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1419 Gas and Electricity - Analog Meters - Purchase and Installation Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1434 Business Regulation - Marina Fuel Sales - Fuel Sales Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1473 (SB1082) Gas and Electric Companies - Deposit Charges Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1533 (SB0658) Termination of Electric or Gas Service - Prohibition Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0054 (HB0055/CH0238) Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2017 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0158 /CH0390 Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup Fund Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0355 /CH0388 (HB0414) Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation Costs Senator Serafini 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Finance
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0658 (HB1533) Termination of Electric or Gas Service - Prohibition Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0740 (HB1325/CH0013) Oil and Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0847 Retail Service Station Dealers - Gas Prices - Required Signage Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0980 (HB1461) Environment - Natural Gas and Oil Interest Restitution Fund Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1082 (HB1473) Gas and Electric Companies - Deposit Charges Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM