Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fuel -see also- Coal

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0272
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0878
Title
Public Utilities - Renewable Energy - Electric and Gas Bills (100% Clean Renewable Energy Equity Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0939
Title
Regional Carbon Cost Collection Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1274
Title
Gas and Electricity - Smart Meters - Customer Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1333
Title
Gas and Electricity - Analog Meters - Purchase and Installation
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1387
Title
Consumer Relations - Natural Gas Infrastructure - Notice of Work
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1456 /CH0626 (SB1128)
Title
Offshore Drilling Liability Act
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1463
Title
Gas and Electricity - Analog, Digital, and Smart Meters - Meter Exchange and Transmission of Information
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1667
Title
Gas and Electric Companies - Deposit Charges
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0013
Title
Opposition to Proposed National Outer Continental Shelf Oil and Gas Leasing Program
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0457
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1029
Title
Oil and Gas Drilling and Production - Restrictions
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1046
Title
Gas Price Clarity Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1128 (HB1456/CH0626)
Title
Offshore Drilling Liability Act
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0011
Title
Coastal Area - Protection From Offshore Oil and Gas Drilling
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0272 Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB0878 Public Utilities - Renewable Energy - Electric and Gas Bills (100% Clean Renewable Energy Equity Act of 2018) Delegate Robinson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/05/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB0939 Regional Carbon Cost Collection Initiative Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB1274 Gas and Electricity - Smart Meters - Customer Rights Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1333 Gas and Electricity - Analog Meters - Purchase and Installation Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1387 Consumer Relations - Natural Gas Infrastructure - Notice of Work Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1456 /CH0626 (SB1128) Offshore Drilling Liability Act Delegate Barve 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626
Judiciary
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
HB1463 Gas and Electricity - Analog, Digital, and Smart Meters - Meter Exchange and Transmission of Information Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1667 Gas and Electric Companies - Deposit Charges Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HJ0013 Opposition to Proposed National Outer Continental Shelf Oil and Gas Leasing Program Delegate Flanagan 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0457 Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1029 Oil and Gas Drilling and Production - Restrictions Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1046 Gas Price Clarity Act of 2018 Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1128 (HB1456/CH0626) Offshore Drilling Liability Act Senator Mathias 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SJ0011 Coastal Area - Protection From Offshore Oil and Gas Drilling Senator Mathias 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 11:30 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2018 - 11:30 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM