Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fuel Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0176
Title
Transportation Trust Fund Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0524 (SB0643)
Title
Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0660 (SB0827)
Title
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0668
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Exemption - Use in County-Owned Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0962
Title
Motor Fuel Taxes - Consumer Disclosure Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1046
Title
Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1210
Title
Waterway Improvement Fund - Revenue Distributions - Marinas
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1302
Title
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1515 /CH0429 (SB1054)
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0090 /CH0180 (HB0548)
Title
Natural Resources - Vessel Excise Tax - Waterway Improvement Fund
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0253
Title
Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway Funds
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0574
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Exemption - Use in City- or County-Owned Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Robey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0643 (HB0524)
Title
End the Gridlock
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0652
Title
Motor Fuel - Mass Transit Tax - Transit Funding
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0827 (HB0660)
Title
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0829 /CH0422
Title
Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0830
Title
Transportation Financing Act
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1013
Title
Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds - Transit Financing
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1054 (HB1515/CH0429)
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0176 Transportation Trust Fund Protection Act Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0524 (SB0643) Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Rules
HB0660 (SB0827) Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013 Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0668 Motor Fuel Tax - Exemption - Use in County-Owned Vehicles Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0962 Motor Fuel Taxes - Consumer Disclosure Requirements Delegate Bates 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1046 Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway Funds Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1210 Waterway Improvement Fund - Revenue Distributions - Marinas Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1302 Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1515 /CH0429 (SB1054) Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0090 /CH0180 (HB0548) Natural Resources - Vessel Excise Tax - Waterway Improvement Fund Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0253 Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway Funds Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0574 Motor Fuel Tax - Exemption - Use in City- or County-Owned Vehicles Senator Robey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0643 (HB0524) End the Gridlock Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0652 Motor Fuel - Mass Transit Tax - Transit Funding Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0827 (HB0660) Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013 Senator Garagiola 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0829 /CH0422 Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds Senator Miller 2 2 Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 422
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
Ways and Means
SB0830 Transportation Financing Act Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB1013 Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds - Transit Financing Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1054 (HB1515/CH0429) Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM