Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Fuel Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0122
Title
Task Force to Study the Impact of State and Local Taxes on Small Businesses
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0174
Title
Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0221 (SB0073)
Title
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0483 (SB0589)
Title
Motorist Tax Relief - Motor Fuel Tax - Consumer Price Index and Sales and Use Tax Equivalent Rate Adjustments - Repeal
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0774
Title
Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0837
Title
Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0899
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Distribution of Revenue - Local Governments
Sponsor
Delegate Vogt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1003
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Distribution of Revenue
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0010
Title
Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0073 (HB0221)
Title
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0589 (HB0483)
Title
Motorist Tax Relief - Motor Fuel Tax - Consumer Price Index and Sales and Use Tax Equivalent Rate Adjustments - Repeal
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0122 Task Force to Study the Impact of State and Local Taxes on Small Businesses Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0174 Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0221 (SB0073) Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0483 (SB0589) Motorist Tax Relief - Motor Fuel Tax - Consumer Price Index and Sales and Use Tax Equivalent Rate Adjustments - Repeal Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0774 Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled
Ways and Means
HB0837 Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0899 Motor Fuel Tax - Distribution of Revenue - Local Governments Delegate Vogt 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1003 Motor Fuel Tax - Distribution of Revenue Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0010 Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0073 (HB0221) Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0589 (HB0483) Motorist Tax Relief - Motor Fuel Tax - Consumer Price Index and Sales and Use Tax Equivalent Rate Adjustments - Repeal President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM