Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Fuel Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1284
Title
State Tax Credits, Exemptions, and Deductions - Alterations and Repeal (Tax Modernization Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1628
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction and Services
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0108
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Qualified Commuters
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0941
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Claims for Refund
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1284 State Tax Credits, Exemptions, and Deductions - Alterations and Repeal (Tax Modernization Act) Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1628 Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction and Services Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/02/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0108 Income Tax - Credit for Qualified Commuters Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/15/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0941 Motor Fuel Tax - Claims for Refund Senator Hayes 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/16/2020 11:28 AM