Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Funerals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0313 (SB0357)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments - Inspections
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0314 /CH0243 (SB0358/CH0242)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Authority to Discipline - Funeral Establishment Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0349 /CH0099
Title
Business Regulation - Cemeteries - Prohibited Acts and Penalties
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0529 /CH0376 (SB0463)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprentice Sponsors, Funeral Establishment Licenses, and Supervising Morticians
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0889 (SB0621/CH0066)
Title
Vehicles Laws - Emergency Vehicles - Motorcades and Escorts
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0905 (SB0335/CH0231)
Title
Health Occupations - Funeral Establishments - Preparation and Holding Rooms
Sponsor
Delegate Kach
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0906
Title
Public Health - Handling of Human Remains - Transportation
Sponsor
Delegate Kach
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0335 /CH0231 (HB0905)
Title
Health Occupations - Funeral Establishments - Preparation and Holding Rooms
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0357 (HB0313)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments - Inspections
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0358 /CH0242 (HB0314/CH0243)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Authority to Discipline - Funeral Establishment Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0463 (HB0529/CH0376)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprentice Sponsors, Funeral Establishment Licenses, and Supervising Morticians
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0621 /CH0066 (HB0889)
Title
Vehicles Laws - Emergency Vehicles - Motorcades and Escorts
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0313 (SB0357) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments - Inspections Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0314 /CH0243 (SB0358/CH0242) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Authority to Discipline - Funeral Establishment Licenses Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0349 /CH0099 Business Regulation - Cemeteries - Prohibited Acts and Penalties Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0529 /CH0376 (SB0463) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprentice Sponsors, Funeral Establishment Licenses, and Supervising Morticians Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 376
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0889 (SB0621/CH0066) Vehicles Laws - Emergency Vehicles - Motorcades and Escorts Delegate Malone 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0905 (SB0335/CH0231) Health Occupations - Funeral Establishments - Preparation and Holding Rooms Delegate Kach 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0906 Public Health - Handling of Human Remains - Transportation Delegate Kach 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0335 /CH0231 (HB0905) Health Occupations - Funeral Establishments - Preparation and Holding Rooms Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0357 (HB0313) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments - Inspections Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0358 /CH0242 (HB0314/CH0243) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Authority to Discipline - Funeral Establishment Licenses Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0463 (HB0529/CH0376) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprentice Sponsors, Funeral Establishment Licenses, and Supervising Morticians Senator Conway 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0621 /CH0066 (HB0889) Vehicles Laws - Emergency Vehicles - Motorcades and Escorts Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 66
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM