Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Funerals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0024
Title
Estates and Trusts - Allowance for Funeral Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0321 (SB0159)
Title
Funeral Establishments - Pre-Need Contracts - Reporting and Audit Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0463 /CH0249
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishment Licenses - Ownership and Operation Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0512 (SB0148/CH0017)
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight - Preneed Burial Contracts - Report Submission Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0624 /CH0443
Title
Estates and Trusts - Funeral Expenses Allowance - Modified Administration
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1062
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments - Care and Custody of Human Remains
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0148 /CH0017 (HB0512)
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight - Preneed Burial Contracts - Report Submission Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0159 (HB0321)
Title
Funeral Establishments - Pre-Need Contracts - Reporting and Audit Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0420
Title
Estates and Trusts - Funeral Expenses Allowance - Modified Administration
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0024 Estates and Trusts - Allowance for Funeral Expenses Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0321 (SB0159) Funeral Establishments - Pre-Need Contracts - Reporting and Audit Requirements Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0463 /CH0249 State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishment Licenses - Ownership and Operation Requirements Delegate Young, K. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0512 (SB0148/CH0017) Office of Cemetery Oversight - Preneed Burial Contracts - Report Submission Requirement Delegate Young, K. 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0624 /CH0443 Estates and Trusts - Funeral Expenses Allowance - Modified Administration Delegate Miele 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1062 State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments - Care and Custody of Human Remains Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0148 /CH0017 (HB0512) Office of Cemetery Oversight - Preneed Burial Contracts - Report Submission Requirement Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 17
Finance
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0159 (HB0321) Funeral Establishments - Pre-Need Contracts - Reporting and Audit Requirements Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0420 Estates and Trusts - Funeral Expenses Allowance - Modified Administration Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM
Click to return on the top page