Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Funerals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0106 (SB0439)
Title
Health Occupations - Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprenticeships
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0839 (SB0539)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023
Title
Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0084
Title
Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Notification, Disposition, and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0439 (HB0106)
Title
Health Occupations - Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprenticeships
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0539 (HB0839)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0917
Title
Transport of a Body After Anatomical Gift - Fees - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0106 (SB0439) Health Occupations - Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprenticeships Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0839 (SB0539) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/24/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0023 Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
1/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0084 Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Notification, Disposition, and Reporting Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2020 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0439 (HB0106) Health Occupations - Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprenticeships Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0539 (HB0839) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0917 Transport of a Body After Anatomical Gift - Fees - Prohibition Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/14/2020 11:06 AM