Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ethics (G2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0141
Title
Ethics Law - Soliciting the Employment of Lobbyist
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0142
Title
General Assembly - Advocating for or Directing an Entity to Hire a Member's Relative - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0143
Title
Former Members of the General Assembly and Former Legislative Branch Officials - Employment Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0144
Title
Ethics - Executive Branch - Lobbying by Former Officials
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0222
Title
General Assembly - Disclosure of Financial Interests
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0362 /CH0615
Title
Public Ethics - Definition of "Interest" - Mutual Funds
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0432 (SB0316)
Title
Frederick County - Ethics - Former Officials and Employees
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0867
Title
General Assembly - Use of Public Resources - Ballot Issues
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1023
Title
Public Ethics - Blind Industries and Services of Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113
Title
Procurement - Disclosure Requirements and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Bohanan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1193
Title
Ethics - Lobbying Registration - State and Local Government Entities and Associations
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1397 (SB1065)
Title
Public Ethics - Public Officials, Local Governments, and Lobbyists - Training, Reporting, and Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Bobo
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1429 /CH0418
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Former Officials and Employees - Employment
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0316 (HB0432)
Title
Frederick County - Ethics - Former Officials and Employees
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0665
Title
Public Ethics Laws - Meals - Regulated Lobbyist Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0695
Title
Public Ethics - General Assembly - Employment with Political Subdivisions and Public Institutions of Higher Education
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0869
Title
Public Ethics - Members of the General Assembly - Meals, Receptions, and Beverages
Sponsor
Senator Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1065 (HB1397)
Title
Public Ethics - Public Officials, Local Governments, and Lobbyists - Training, Reporting, and Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0141 Ethics Law - Soliciting the Employment of Lobbyist Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0142 General Assembly - Advocating for or Directing an Entity to Hire a Member's Relative - Prohibited Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0143 Former Members of the General Assembly and Former Legislative Branch Officials - Employment Restrictions Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0144 Ethics - Executive Branch - Lobbying by Former Officials Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0222 General Assembly - Disclosure of Financial Interests Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0362 /CH0615 Public Ethics - Definition of "Interest" - Mutual Funds Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 615
Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0432 (SB0316) Frederick County - Ethics - Former Officials and Employees Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0867 General Assembly - Use of Public Resources - Ballot Issues Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1023 Public Ethics - Blind Industries and Services of Maryland Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 Procurement - Disclosure Requirements and Penalties Delegate Bohanan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1193 Ethics - Lobbying Registration - State and Local Government Entities and Associations Delegate Hucker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1397 (SB1065) Public Ethics - Public Officials, Local Governments, and Lobbyists - Training, Reporting, and Enforcement Delegate Bobo 6 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Environmental Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1429 /CH0418 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Former Officials and Employees - Employment Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0316 (HB0432) Frederick County - Ethics - Former Officials and Employees Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0665 Public Ethics Laws - Meals - Regulated Lobbyist Reporting Requirements Senator Kittleman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0695 Public Ethics - General Assembly - Employment with Political Subdivisions and Public Institutions of Higher Education Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0869 Public Ethics - Members of the General Assembly - Meals, Receptions, and Beverages Senator Kittleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 9:00 a.m.
Rules
3/13/2013 - 9:00 AM
SB1065 (HB1397) Public Ethics - Public Officials, Local Governments, and Lobbyists - Training, Reporting, and Enforcement Senator Raskin 6 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM