Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ethics (G2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0130
Title
Lobbying - Legislative Unit Meals and Receptions - Publication of Report (General Assembly Online Social Calendar)
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0200
Title
Election Law - Legislative Newsletters - Distribution by Electronic Mail
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0496 /CH0177 (SB0194/CH0176)
Title
Ethics Commission, Commission on Judicial Disabilities, Judicial Ethics Committee, and Joint Ethics Committee - Duties
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0726
Title
Ethics - Reports of Regulated Lobbyists - Open Data Format
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1164
Title
Election Law - Contribution to a Candidate for Judicial Office
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0194 /CH0176 (HB0496/CH0177)
Title
Ethics Commission, Commission on Judicial Disabilities, Judicial Ethics Committee, and Joint Ethics Committee - Duties
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0395 /CH0201
Title
Ethics - Local Government - Conflict of Interest and Financial Disclosure
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0807
Title
Higher Education - Ethics and Procurement Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0130 Lobbying - Legislative Unit Meals and Receptions - Publication of Report (General Assembly Online Social Calendar) Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/12/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0200 Election Law - Legislative Newsletters - Distribution by Electronic Mail Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/12/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0496 /CH0177 (SB0194/CH0176) Ethics Commission, Commission on Judicial Disabilities, Judicial Ethics Committee, and Joint Ethics Committee - Duties Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0726 Ethics - Reports of Regulated Lobbyists - Open Data Format Delegate Carr 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1164 Election Law - Contribution to a Candidate for Judicial Office Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0194 /CH0176 (HB0496/CH0177) Ethics Commission, Commission on Judicial Disabilities, Judicial Ethics Committee, and Joint Ethics Committee - Duties Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2016 - 3:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0395 /CH0201 Ethics - Local Government - Conflict of Interest and Financial Disclosure Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0807 Higher Education - Ethics and Procurement Requirements Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM