Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ethics (G2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0303 (SB0854)
Title
Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour Activities
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0879 /CH0031 (SB0683)
Title
Public Integrity Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0882 (SB0805)
Title
Frederick County - Ethics - Prohibited Contributions to Planning Commission Members
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0976 (SB0550)
Title
Frederick County - Ethics Requirements and Campaign Activity Concerning the County Executive and County Council
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1386 /CH0519
Title
Maryland Public Ethics Law - Members and Employees of Boards of License Commissioners and Liquor Control Boards
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1631 (SB1026)
Title
Public Ethics Law - Conflicts of Interest and Financial Disclosure Statements
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0018 /CH0283
Title
Public Ethics - Bicounty Commissions - Financial Disclosure
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0164
Title
Baltimore County - Ethics - Prohibitions and Requirements Regarding Payments During Pendency of Zoning Applications
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0253 (HB0438)
Title
Legislative Transparency Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0550 (HB0976)
Title
Frederick County - Ethics Requirements and Campaign Activity Concerning the County Executive and County Council
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0683 (HB0879/CH0031)
Title
Public Integrity Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0805 (HB0882)
Title
Frederick County - Ethics - Prohibited Contributions to Planning Commission Members
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0854 (HB0303)
Title
Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour Activities
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1026 (HB1631)
Title
Public Ethics Law - Conflicts of Interest and Financial Disclosure Statements
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0303 (SB0854) Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour Activities Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0879 /CH0031 (SB0683) Public Integrity Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0882 (SB0805) Frederick County - Ethics - Prohibited Contributions to Planning Commission Members Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0976 (SB0550) Frederick County - Ethics Requirements and Campaign Activity Concerning the County Executive and County Council Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1386 /CH0519 Maryland Public Ethics Law - Members and Employees of Boards of License Commissioners and Liquor Control Boards Delegate Lisanti 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1631 (SB1026) Public Ethics Law - Conflicts of Interest and Financial Disclosure Statements Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0018 /CH0283 Public Ethics - Bicounty Commissions - Financial Disclosure Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2017 - 2:15 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0164 Baltimore County - Ethics - Prohibitions and Requirements Regarding Payments During Pendency of Zoning Applications Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0253 (HB0438) Legislative Transparency Act of 2017 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0550 (HB0976) Frederick County - Ethics Requirements and Campaign Activity Concerning the County Executive and County Council Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0683 (HB0879/CH0031) Public Integrity Act of 2017 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0805 (HB0882) Frederick County - Ethics - Prohibited Contributions to Planning Commission Members Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0854 (HB0303) Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour Activities Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1026 (HB1631) Public Ethics Law - Conflicts of Interest and Financial Disclosure Statements Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM