Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ethics (G2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0048
Title
Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics - Confidentiality of Activities - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0419 /CH0130
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Office of the Inspector General PG/MC 101-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1330
Title
Public Ethics Law - Conflicts of Interest - Political Consulting
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1342 /CH0525 (SB1138)
Title
State Government – Discrimination and Harassment
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1469 /CH0530
Title
Ethics - Members of Boards of License Commissioners and Liquor Control Boards
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1788
Title
State Government – Appointments Office in the Office of the Governor – Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0474 /CH0457
Title
Ethics - Local Public Ethics Commissions and Entities - Meeting and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1138 (HB1342/CH0525)
Title
Legislative Branch of State Government - Sexual Harassment
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0048 Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics - Confidentiality of Activities - Repeal Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0419 /CH0130 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Office of the Inspector General PG/MC 101-18 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1330 Public Ethics Law - Conflicts of Interest - Political Consulting Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1342 /CH0525 (SB1138) State Government – Discrimination and Harassment Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/05/2018 - 3:00 PM
Rules
3/30/2018 - 12:30 PM
HB1469 /CH0530 Ethics - Members of Boards of License Commissioners and Liquor Control Boards Delegate Lisanti 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1788 State Government – Appointments Office in the Office of the Governor – Reporting Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0474 /CH0457 Ethics - Local Public Ethics Commissions and Entities - Meeting and Reporting Requirements Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1138 (HB1342/CH0525) Legislative Branch of State Government - Sexual Harassment Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM